Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matthias Geissler

Deceased

Bishop of Wiener Neustadt, Austria


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Jul 1631AppointedBishop of Wiener Neustadt, Austria
31 Aug 1631³Ordained BishopBishop of Wiener Neustadt, Austria
20 Feb 1639DiedBishop of Wiener Neustadt, Austria

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Matthias Geissler
Bishop Matthias Geissler (died ) Bishop of Wiener Neustadt

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEisenstadt

  • a bishop for 7.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 256
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1631, Number 30
  • ob/c2: CB, 17 Apr 2015
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,407

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 Jan 2017