Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Carducci

Deceased

Bishop of Valva e Sulmona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Nov 1610³BornGirolamo
12 Dec 164434.1AppointedBishop of Satriano e Campagna, Italy
21 Dec 164434.1Ordained BishopBishop of Satriano e Campagna, Italy
22 Mar 164938.3AppointedBishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy
5 Nov 165444.0DiedBishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Carducci (VIAF: 90272314)
Bishop Francesco Carducci (born Nov 1610, died ) Bishop of Valva e Sulmona

  • a bishop for 9.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 358, and Page 132
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1644, Number 32
  • ob/c2: AT, 14 Sep 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 16 Sep 2016