Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Mario Cardinal Theodoli

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Imola, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1596¹Born
13 Jul 164347.5Elevated to Cardinal
31 Aug 164347.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Alessio
17 Oct 164448.7AppointedBishop of Imola, Italy
27 Dec 164448.9Ordained BishopBishop of Imola, Italy
19 Feb 164650.1ResignedBishop of Imola, Italy
28 Jan 164953.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo
27 Jun 165054.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Imola, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Mario Theodoli (VIAF: 230701548)
Mario Cardinal Theodoli (born 1596, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Imola

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopS. Catarina di Sienna, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)Santa Maria del Popolo, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 5.5 years
  • a cardinal for 6.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 13 Jul 1643
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 209
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 109, Number 662
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1644, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 Jan 2017