Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leonardo Leria, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Minori


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1610¹BornRoma
22 Mar 164939.2AppointedBishop of Minori, Italy
6 Apr 164939.2Ordained BishopBishop of Minori, Italy
1670¹60.0ResignedBishop of Minori, Italy
6 Aug 167161.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Minori, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Leonardo Leria:
Bishop Leonardo Leria O. Carm. (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Minori

  • a bishop for 22.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 244
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1649, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 23 Mar 2015