Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop Jean-Baptiste Aubert] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of [Bouches-du-Rhône (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Aug 1731Born
29 Apr 179866.7SelectedBishop of [Bouches-du-Rhône (Constitutional), France]
6 May 179866.7Ordained BishopBishop of [Bouches-du-Rhône (Constitutional), France]
16 Oct 180170.1ResignedBishop of [Bouches-du-Rhône (Constitutional), France]
16 Feb 181684.5DiedBishop Emeritus of [Bouches-du-Rhône (Constitutional), France]

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste Aubert
Bishop Jean-Baptiste Aubert (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bouches-du-Rhône

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFontvieille
Ordained BishopS. Sauveur, Aix-en-Provence
Death PlaceFontvieille

  • a bishop for 17.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1798, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast