Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jonny Eduardo Reyes Sequera, S.D.B.

Vicar Apostolic of Puerto Ayacucho, Venezuela

Titular Bishop of Canapium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1952 Born
31 Aug 196916.9ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
6 Jun 197623.6Perpetual VowsMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
8 Dec 197927.1Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
14 Oct 201563.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Puerto Ayacucho, Venezuela
14 Oct 201563.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Canapium
10 Jan 201663.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Canapium

MicroData Summary for Jonny Eduardo Reyes Sequera
Bishop Jonny Eduardo Reyes Sequera S.D.B. (born ) Vicar Apostolic of Puerto Ayacucho

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCaracas

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Puerto Ayacucho.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Oct 2015
  • ob: CB, 17 Nov 2015
  • c2+: CB, 6 Jan 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 226, Number 18,794

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018