Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrés Rosales y Muñoz

Deceased

Bishop of Almería, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1807Born
25 Jun 185850.6AppointedBishop of Jaén, Spain
7 Nov 185851.0Ordained BishopBishop of Jaén, Spain
16 Mar 186456.4SelectedBishop of Almería, Spain
22 Sep 186456.9ConfirmedBishop of Almería, Spain
10 Oct 187264.9DiedBishop of Almería, Spain

MicroData Summary for Andrés Rosales y Muñoz
Bishop Andrés Rosales y Muñoz (born , died ) Bishop of Almería

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIznájar
Ordained BishopCathedral, Granada, Archdiocese of Granada
Death PlaceAlmería, Diocese of Almería

  • a bishop for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 91, and Page 286
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 167, Number 916
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1858, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast