Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Helmut Reckter, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop of Chinhoyi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Nov 1933BornArenberg
31 Jul 196430.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
22 Feb 197440.2AppointedPrefect of Sinoia, Zimbabwe
28 Oct 198551.9AppointedBishop of Chinhoyi, Zimbabwe
5 Jan 198652.1Ordained BishopBishop of Chinhoyi, Zimbabwe
10 Mar 200470.3DiedBishop of Chinhoyi, Zimbabwe

MicroData Summary for Helmut Reckter:
Bishop Helmut Reckter S.J. (born , died ) Bishop of Chinhoyi

  • a priest for 39.6 years
  • a bishop for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013