Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Antonio Foscarini, C.R.L. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Corf¨, Greece


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1688Born
18 May 172334.6Ordained PriestPriest of Canons Regular of the Congregation of the Most Holy Saviour of the Lateran
3 Mar 173243.4AppointedArchbishop of Corf¨, Greece
9 Mar 173243.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Corf¨, Greece
Dec 1739³51.2DiedArchbishop of Corf¨, Greece

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Antonio Foscarini
Archbishop Giovanni Antonio Foscarini C.R.L. (born , died Dec 1739) Archbishop of Corf¨

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Italy

  • a priest for 16.5 years
  • a bishop for 7.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 182
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1732, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast