Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop René Joseph Rakotondrabé

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Toamasina, Madagascar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1932Born
11 Apr 196027.5Ordained PriestPriest
25 Mar 197239.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tuléar, Madagascar
25 Mar 197239.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Umbriatico
1 Oct 197240.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Umbriatico
28 Feb 197441.4AppointedBishop of Tuléar, Madagascar
15 May 198956.6AppointedBishop of Toamasina, Madagascar
24 Nov 200876.1RetiredBishop of Toamasina, Madagascar
9 Jul 201279.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Toamasina, Madagascar

MicroData Summary for René Joseph Rakotondrabé
Bishop René Joseph Rakotondrabé (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Toamasina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFandriana

  • a priest for 52.2 years
  • a bishop for 39.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 24 Nov 2008
  • d: CB, 9 Jul 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast