Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Egidio Quinto, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1653³Born
21 Mar 170753.9AppointedBishop of Sapë, Albania
26 Jun 170754.2Ordained BishopBishop of Sapë, Albania
8 Feb 171965.8AppointedArchbishop of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro
1 Jun 172269.1DiedArchbishop of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Egidio Quinto
Archbishop Egidio Quinto O.F.M. (born , died ) Archbishop of Bar (Antivari)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArmento

  • a bishop for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1707
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 88, and Page 344
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1707, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast