Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Julian Charles Porteous

Archbishop of Hobart, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1949 Born
7 Sep 197425.2Ordained PriestPriest of Sydney, Australia
16 Jul 200354.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sydney, Australia
16 Jul 200354.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Urusi
3 Sep 200354.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Urusi
19 Jul 201364.1AppointedArchbishop of Hobart, Australia
17 Sep 201364.2InstalledArchbishop of Hobart, Australia

MicroData Summary for Julian Charles Porteous
Archbishop Julian Charles Porteous (born ) Archbishop of Hobart

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSydney

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Hobart.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,449
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Jul 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast