Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriele Perlo, I.M.C. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Mogadiscio

Titular Bishop of Amyzon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 May 1879BornFossano, Italy
24 Jun 190223.1Ordained PriestPriest of Consolata Missionaries
22 Dec 192748.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Mogadiscio, Somalia
22 Dec 192748.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Amyzon
27 Feb 192848.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amyzon
Aug 1930³51.2ResignedVicar Apostolic of Mogadiscio, Somalia
26 Sep 194869.4DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Mogadiscio, Somalia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gabriele Perlo:
Bishop Gabriele Perlo I.M.C. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Mogadiscio

  • a priest for 46.3 years
  • a bishop for 20.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1949
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1928, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013