Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Felice Pirozzi

Deceased

President of the Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy

Titular Archbishop of Gratiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1908Born
19 Jul 193122.7Ordained PriestPriest
23 Sep 196051.9AppointedApostolic Delegate to Madagascar
28 Oct 196153.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Gratiana
31 Dec 196153.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Gratiana
9 Jan 196758.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Venezuela
17 Oct 197061.9AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy
25 Jul 197566.7DiedPresident of the Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy

MicroData Summary for Felice Pirozzi
Archbishop Felice Pirozzi (born , died ) President of Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy

EventPlace
Birth PlacePomigliano d'Arco
Ordained BishopHoly Family, Cathedral, Nairobi, Archdiocese of Nairobi, Kenya

  • a priest for 44.0 years
  • a bishop for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 275, Ascendance
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 7, Number 352

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast