Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop René-Désiré-Romain Boisguérin, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Yibin [Suifu], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1901Born
192018.1ProfessedMember of La Société des Missions Etrangères
17 Dec 192726.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of La Société des Missions Etrangères
29 Jun 192826.6Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
10 Jan 194644.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Suifu [Yibin], China
10 Jan 194644.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Celenderis
11 Apr 194644.4AppointedBishop of Yibin [Suifu], China
1 May 194644.5Ordained BishopBishop of Yibin [Suifu], China
1983²81.1ResignedBishop of Yibin [Suifu], China
13 Feb 199896.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Yibin [Suifu], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for René-Désiré-Romain Boisguérin
Bishop René-Désiré-Romain Boisguérin M.E.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Yibin [Suifu]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFalaise, Diocese of Bayeux (-Lisieux), France
Ordained DeaconForeign Missions, Chapel, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained PriestForeign Missions, Chapel, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained BishopOur Lady of the Martyrs, Church, Ipin, Diocese of Yibin [Suifu]
Death PlaceLauris, Archdiocese of Avignon (-Apt, Cavaillon, Carpentras, Orange, e Vaison), France

  • a priest for 69.6 years
  • a bishop for 51.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 32
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 11 Jul 2018

Quantcast