Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Niccolò Mazzoni

Deceased

Bishop of Terni, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Nov 1770Born
5 Apr 179423.4Ordained PriestPriest
21 May 182958.5AppointedBishop of Terni, Italy
7 Jun 182958.5Ordained BishopBishop of Terni, Italy
11 Nov 184272.0DiedBishop of Terni, Italy

MicroData Summary for Niccolò Mazzoni
Bishop Niccolò Mazzoni (born , died ) Bishop of Terni

EventPlace
Birth PlaceViterbo

  • a priest for 48.5 years
  • a bishop for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 224
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1829, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast