Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Victor Hlolo Phalana

Bishop of Klerksdorp


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1961 BornErasmus, Odi
14 May 198827.1Ordained PriestPriest of Pretoria, South Africa
24 Nov 201453.6AppointedBishop of Klerksdorp, South Africa
25 Jan 201553.8Ordained BishopBishop of Klerksdorp, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Victor Hlolo Phalana:
Bishop Victor Hlolo Phalana (born ) Bishop of Klerksdorp

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Klerksdorp.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Nov 2014
  • ob: CB, 9 Dec 2014
  • c2+: CB, 19 Jan 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Number 18,357

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015