Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Enrique Peralta y Cárdenas

Deceased

Archbishop of Burgos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1593¹BornMadrid
26 Jan 165461.0AppointedBishop of Almería, Spain
14 Jun 165461.4Ordained BishopBishop of Almería, Spain
17 Aug 165865.6SelectedBishop of Palencia, Spain
13 Jan 165966.0ConfirmedBishop of Palencia, Spain
13 Apr 166572.2AppointedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
20 Nov 167986.8DiedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Enrique Peralta y Cárdenas:
Archbishop Enrique Peralta y Cárdenas (born 1593, died ) Archbishop of Burgos

  • a bishop for 25.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,429
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 271
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 79, and Page 124
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 184, Number 1,150
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1654, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015