Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cristóbal Guzmán Santoyo

Deceased

Bishop of Palencia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1578BornGuzmán
6 Jun 163354.6AppointedBishop of Palencia, Spain
11 Jun 163455.6Ordained BishopBishop of Palencia, Spain
17 Nov 165678.0DiedBishop of Palencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Cristóbal Guzmán Santoyo:
Bishop Cristóbal Guzmán Santoyo (born , died ) Bishop of Palencia

  • a bishop for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,503
  • bp/bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013