Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Enrique Pimentel Z˙˝iga

Deceased

Bishop of Cuenca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1574BornBenavides de Orvigo
20 Mar 161439.6Ordained PriestPriest
29 Jul 161945.0AppointedBishop of Valladolid, Spain
8 Dec 161945.3Ordained BishopBishop of Valladolid, Spain
13 Feb 162348.5AppointedBishop of Cuenca, Spain
11 Jun 165378.8DiedBishop of Cuenca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Enrique Pimentel Z˙˝iga:
Bishop Enrique Pimentel Z˙˝iga (born , died ) Bishop of Cuenca

  • a priest for 39.2 years
  • a bishop for 33.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,385
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 159, and Page 357
  • b/c23: Episcopologio Espa˝ol, Volume 1500, Page 138, Number 882

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 6 Jan 2014