Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Fernando Acevedo González

Deceased

Archbishop of Burgos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1573¹BornHoznayo
5 Jul 161037.5AppointedBishop of Osma, Spain
22 Aug 1610³37.6Ordained BishopBishop of Osma, Spain
2 Jun 161340.4AppointedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
2 Feb 1629³56.0DiedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fernando Acevedo González:
Archbishop Fernando Acevedo González (died ) Archbishop of Burgos

  • a bishop for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 123, and Page 268
  • bp/bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 126, Number 805
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1610, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 17 Feb 2015