Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan Pérez Delgado

Deceased

Archbishop of Burgos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1586¹BornPalomera
3 Dec 164660.9AppointedBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
31 Mar 164761.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
8 May 165569.3SelectedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
11 Oct 165569.7ConfirmedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
15 Jan 165771.0AppointedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
15 Jul 165771.5DiedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Pérez Delgado:
Archbishop Juan Pérez Delgado (died ) Archbishop of Burgos

  • a bishop for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 124, and Page 151
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 301
  • ob/c2: CB, 7 Jul 2013
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,813
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 177, Number 1,104

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015