Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Domingo Cardinal Pimentel Z˙˝iga, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Sevilla {Seville}

Cardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Oct 1585BornSegovia
160317.2ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
2 Dec 163045.1AppointedBishop of Osma, Spain
25 May 163145.6Ordained BishopBishop of Osma, Spain
18 Jul 163347.7AppointedBishop of Cˇrdoba, Spain
2 May 164963.5SelectedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
19 Jul 164963.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
19 Feb 165266.3Elevated to Cardinal
2 Dec 165267.1ResignedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
23 Jun 165367.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite
2 Dec 165368.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

MicroData Summary for Domingo Pimentel Z˙˝iga:
Domingo Cardinal Pimentel Z˙˝iga O.P. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Sevilla {Seville}

  • a bishop for 22.5 years
  • a cardinal for 1.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Feb 1652
  • bd/ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,839
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 164, and Page 204
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 268
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Espa˝ol, Volume 1500, Page 154, Number 973
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015