Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pedro Carrillo Acuña y Bureba

Deceased

Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1595Born
1630²34.8Ordained PriestPriest
21 Apr 164853.1SelectedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
27 Jul 164853.4ConfirmedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
22 Nov 164853.7Ordained BishopBishop of Salamanca, Spain
30 Aug 165560.5AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
Apr 1664³69.1DiedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Carrillo Acuña y Bureba
Archbishop Pedro Carrillo Acuña y Bureba (born , died Apr 1664) Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTordómar

  • a priest for 34.2 years
  • a bishop for 15.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 301, and Page 158
  • b/ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,864
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 178, Number 1,108
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,648, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast