Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diego Cardinal Espinosa Arévalo

Deceased

Bishop of Sigüenza, Spain

Cardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Sep 1502³Born
1564²61.3Ordained PriestPriest
24 Mar 156865.5Elevated to Cardinal
14 May 156865.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Bartolomeo all’Isola
5 Jul 156865.8AppointedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
20 Aug 156865.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio
5 Sep 157270.0DiedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diego Espinosa Arévalo (VIAF: 86881678)
Diego Cardinal Espinosa Arévalo (born Sep 1502, died ) Bishop of Sigüenza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMartín Muñoz de las Posadas, Diocese of Segovia
Death PlaceMadrid
Buried Place (Original)Nuestra Señora de la Asunción, Church, Martín Muñoz de las Posadas, Diocese of Segovia

  • a priest for 8.6 years
  • a cardinal for 4.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 Mar 1568
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 80, Number 474
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1568, Number 9*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast