Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arochiasamy Jude Gerald Paulraj

Bishop Emeritus of Palayamkottai, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Apr 1943 Born
8 Dec 196825.6Ordained PriestPriest
23 Oct 200057.4AppointedBishop of Palayamkottai, India
8 Dec 200057.6Ordained BishopBishop of Palayamkottai, India
29 Jun 201875.1RetiredBishop of Palayamkottai, India

MicroData Summary for Arochiasamy Jude Gerald Paulraj
Bishop Arochiasamy Jude Gerald Paulraj (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Palayamkottai

EventPlace
Birth PlacePazhayakovil
Ordained BishopPalayamkottai, Diocese of Palayamkottai

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Palayamkottai.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 161, Number 13,865
  • r: CB, 29 Jun 2018
  • r: Bollettino, 2 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 2 Jul 2018

Quantcast