Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Lorenzo Carlo Pampirio, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Vercelli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1836Born
1853²16.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
31 Jul 185922.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
27 Feb 188043.2AppointedBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
14 Mar 188043.2Ordained BishopBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
24 May 188952.4AppointedArchbishop of Vercelli, Italy
26 Dec 190468.0DiedArchbishop of Vercelli, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Carlo Pampirio (VIAF: 89647028)
Archbishop Lorenzo Carlo Pampirio O.P. (born , died ) Archbishop of Vercelli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBosco Marengo
Ordained BishopSte Sabine, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 45.4 years
  • a bishop for 24.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 86, and Page 586
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1880, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017