Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Vicariate Apostolic of Harar

Apostolicus Vicariatus Hararensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Vicariate Apostolic
  • Name Changed: 25 March 1937
  • Vicariate
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Ethiopia
  • Square Kilometers: 260,000 (100,425 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, P.O. Box 177, Harar, Ethiopia
  • Telephone: (025)666.04.17
  • Fax: 666.36.60

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Galla
4 May 1846ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Abyssinia Vicariate Apostolic of Galla (erected)
28 January 1913Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Galla Prefecture Apostolic of Southern Kaffa {Kaffa Meridionale} (erected)
28 April 1914Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Galla Prefecture Apostolic of Djibouti (erected)
25 March 1937Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Galla
Prefecture Apostolic of Kaffa
Prefecture Apostolic of Neghelli (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Harar
25 March 1937Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Galla Vicariate Apostolic of Harar
6 March 1980Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Harar Prefecture Apostolic of Meki (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Harar
19507,7562,000,000.4%1411551731ap1951
19709,8002,250,000.4%911204902260ap1971
198015,3002,913,000.5%5333840247693ap1981
199012,7503,812,000.3%31114910205214ap1991
199921,1505,026,000.4%117181,175195617ap2000
200023,1155,700,000.4%220221,050266319ap2001
200123,0005,700,000.4%51924958256320ap2002
200223,1755,700,000.4%62026891266319ap2003
200323,2005,700,000.4%6202689283119ap2004
200423,2105,700,000.4%62026892266320ap2005
201023,6005,810,500.4%121527874174818ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.7, 12 Feb 2013; data: 17 Feb 2013