Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Adalric Benziger, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Quilon

Titular Archbishop of Antinoë

Note/Previous Titular See: (Aloysius a Sancta Maria)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1864BornEinsiedela
25 May 188521.3ProfessedMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
22 Dec 188824.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
17 Jul 190036.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Quilon, India
17 Jul 190036.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Tabae
18 Nov 190036.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tabae
16 Aug 190541.5SucceededBishop of Quilon, India
23 Jul 193167.5ResignedBishop of Quilon, India
23 Jul 193167.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Antinoë
17 Aug 194278.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Quilon, India

MicroData Summary for Adalric Benziger:
Archbishop Adalric Benziger O.C.D. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Quilon

  • a priest for 53.7 years
  • a bishop for 41.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 474, and Page 533

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013