Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Felipe Arguinzonis y Astorbiza, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Verapoly, India

Titular Archbishop of Larissa in Thessalia

Note/Previous Titular See: (Bernardo de Jesús)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 May 1852Born
10 Jun 187624.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
14 Jan 189643.6AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Verapoly, India
14 Jan 189643.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Philippi
9 Aug 189644.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Philippi
19 Aug 189745.2SucceededArchbishop of Verapoly, India
18 Dec 191866.5ResignedArchbishop of Verapoly, India
18 Dec 191866.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Larissa in Thessalia
5 May 193380.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Verapoly, India

MicroData Summary for Felipe Arguinzonis y Astorbiza
Archbishop Felipe Arguinzonis y Astorbiza O.C.D. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Verapoly

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZornoza, Spain
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Church, Manjummel

  • a priest for 56.9 years
  • a bishop for 36.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 453
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1896, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017