Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rodrigo Antonio de Orellana, O. Praem. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ávila, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1755Born
9 Sep 180549.8AppointedBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
10 Sep 180953.8Ordained BishopBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
8 Oct 180953.9InstalledBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
21 Dec 181863.1AppointedBishop of Ávila, Spain
29 Jul 182266.7DiedBishop of Ávila, Spain

MicroData Summary for Rodrigo Antonio de Orellana
Bishop Rodrigo Antonio de Orellana O. Praem. (born , died ) Bishop of Ávila

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMedellín

  • a bishop for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1809, Number 11
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 55, and Page 163
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 128, Number 686

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast