Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ángel Mariano Moscoso Pérez y Oblitas

Deceased

Bishop of Córdoba (Tucumán)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1732³BornArequipa
27 Oct 178755.0SelectedBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
10 Mar 178855.4ConfirmedBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
Jul 1789³56.7Ordained BishopBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
11 Oct 1804³72.0DiedBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ángel Mariano Moscoso Pérez y Oblitas
Bishop Ángel Mariano Moscoso Pérez y Oblitas (born , died ) Bishop of Córdoba (Tucumán)

  • a bishop for 15.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,909
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1789, Number 24
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 420

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 11 Mar 2016