Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Alessio Tommasi

Deceased

Bishop of Massa Carrara, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jul 1823Born
19 Sep 184623.1Ordained PriestPriest
6 May 187248.8AppointedBishop of Massa Carrara, Italy
9 May 187248.8Ordained BishopBishop of Massa Carrara, Italy
7 Aug 188764.0DiedBishop of Massa Carrara, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Alessio Tommasi
Bishop Giovanni Battista Alessio Tommasi (born , died ) Bishop of Massa Carrara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceColle di Compito, Archdiocese of Lucca
Ordained BishopSt. Alphonse, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 40.8 years
  • a bishop for 15.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 372
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1872, Number 65

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 10 Jul 2017