Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eduardo María Sáenz La Guardia

Deceased

Bishop of Huesca, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1764Born
4 Sep 181550.9AppointedBishop of Huesca, Spain
3 Dec 181551.1Ordained BishopBishop of Huesca, Spain
1 Feb 183267.3DiedBishop of Huesca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Eduardo María Sáenz La Guardia
Bishop Eduardo María Sáenz La Guardia (born , died ) Bishop of Huesca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMoreda

  • a bishop for 16.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1815, Number 53
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 293
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 133, Number 712

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast