Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Nguyễn Tấn Tước

Bishop of Ph Cường, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1958 Born
4 Apr 199132.5Ordained PriestPriest of Ph Cường, Viet Nam
14 Mar 201152.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Ph Cường, Viet Nam
29 Apr 201152.6Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Ph Cường, Viet Nam
30 Jun 201253.7SucceededBishop of Ph Cường, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Joseph Nguyễn Tấn Tước
Bishop Joseph Nguyễn Tấn Tước (born ) Bishop of Ph Cường

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChanh Hiep

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ph Cường.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Mar 2011
  • CB, 12 Apr 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,044
  • s: Bollettino, 30 Jun 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast