Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Berchmans Nterere

Deceased

Bishop of Muyinga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1942BornNkuna
11 Oct 197028.1Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jan 199249.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Muyinga, Burundi
10 May 199249.6Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Muyinga, Burundi
1 Jul 199451.8SucceededBishop of Muyinga, Burundi
5 May 200158.6DiedBishop of Muyinga, Burundi

MicroData Summary for Jean-Berchmans Nterere:
Bishop Jean-Berchmans Nterere (born , died ) Bishop of Muyinga

  • a priest for 30.5 years
  • a bishop for 8.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130, Number 11,678
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015