Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Xavier Nierhoff, M.S.F. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Floresta, Pernambuco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1913BornFröndenberg, Germany
23 Jun 194027.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Missionaries of the Holy Family
4 Aug 196451.3AppointedBishop of Floresta, Pernambuco, Brazil
29 Nov 196451.6Ordained BishopBishop of Floresta, Pernambuco, Brazil
12 Dec 198875.7RetiredBishop of Floresta, Pernambuco, Brazil
5 Mar 199480.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Floresta, Pernambuco, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Francisco Xavier Nierhoff:
Bishop Francisco Xavier Nierhoff M.S.F. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Floresta

  • a priest for 53.7 years
  • a bishop for 29.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015