Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Joseph Nicholson

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Scotland, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Peristasis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1645¹Born
168237.0Converted
9 Mar 168641.1Ordained PriestPriest
7 Sep 169449.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Scotland, Great Britain
7 Sep 169449.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Peristasis
27 Feb 169550.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Peristasis
12 Oct 1718³73.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Scotland, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Joseph Nicholson
Bishop Thomas Joseph Nicholson (born 1645, died ) Vicar Apostolic of Scotland

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBirkenbog

  • a priest for 32.5 years
  • a bishop for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 310
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1695, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast