Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Francisco Edimilson Neves Ferreira

Bishop-Elect of Tianguá, Ceara, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Oct 1969 Born
12 Dec 199728.1Ordained PriestPriest of Tianguá, Ceara, Brazil
15 Feb 201747.3AppointedBishop of Tianguá, Ceara, Brazil
22 Apr 201747.5Ordained BishopBishop of Tianguá, Ceara, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Francisco Edimilson Neves Ferreira
Father Francisco Edimilson Neves Ferreira (born ) Bishop-Elect of Tianguá

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJardim, Diocese of Crato, Ceara
Ordained BishopNossa Senhora da Penha, Cathedral, Crato, Diocese of Crato, Ceara

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Tianguá.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Feb 2017
  • c2+: CB, 15 Feb 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Feb 2017