Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sébastien-Joseph Muyengo Mulombe

Bishop of Uvira, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1958 Born
1 Aug 198628.2Ordained PriestPriest of Kinshasa, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
2 Feb 201253.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kinshasa, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
2 Feb 201253.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Strathernia
15 Apr 201253.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Strathernia
15 Oct 201355.4AppointedBishop of Uvira, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
8 Dec 201355.5InstalledBishop of Uvira, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Sébastien-Joseph Muyengo Mulombe
Bishop Sébastien-Joseph Muyengo Mulombe (born ) Bishop of Uvira

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBukavu

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Uvira.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2012
  • ob: CB, 16 Feb 2012
  • c2+: CB, 15 Apr 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,422
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Oct 2013
  • i: CB, 22 Nov 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast