Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edouard Mununu Kasiala, O.C.S.O.

Bishop Emeritus of Kikwit


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1936 BornBakanga-Pindi
20 Aug 196731.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Cistercians of the Strict Observance
8 Nov 198448.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kikwit, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
8 Nov 198448.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae Flaviae
24 Mar 198548.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquae Flaviae
10 Mar 198649.5AppointedBishop of Kikwit, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
19 Nov 201680.2RetiredBishop of Kikwit, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Edouard Mununu Kasiala
Bishop Edouard Mununu Kasiala O.C.S.O. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Kikwit

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kikwit.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 19 Nov 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 19 Nov 2016