Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anton Alojzij Wolf

Deceased

Bishop of Ljubljana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jun 1782BornIdria
2 Sep 180422.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
15 Dec 180422.5Ordained PriestPriest
27 Feb 182441.7SelectedBishop of Ljubljana, Slovenia
12 Jul 182442.0ConfirmedBishop of Ljubljana, Slovenia
2 Oct 182442.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ljubljana, Slovenia
7 Feb 185976.6DiedBishop of Ljubljana, Slovenia

MicroData Summary for Anton Alojzij Wolf (VIAF: 52496837)
Bishop Anton Alojzij Wolf (born , died ) Bishop of Ljubljana

  • a priest for 54.1 years
  • a bishop for 34.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 229
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1824, Number 67

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 24 Jul 2016