Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Sebastião Monteiro da Vida, S.J. †

Deceased

Archbishop of São Salvador da Bahia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1643³BornMontforte
29 Aug 167128.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Society of Jesus
30 Aug 167128.4Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
8 Aug 170158.3AppointedArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
21 Dec 170158.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
7 Sep 172279.4DiedArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sebastião Monteiro da Vida:
Archbishop Sebastião Monteiro da Vida S.J. (born , died ) Archbishop of São Salvador da Bahia

  • a priest for 51.0 years
  • a bishop for 20.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 342
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 138, Number 12,292
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1701, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015