Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leo D’Mello

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ajmer and Jaipur


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jul 1903BornDadar
4 Oct 193128.2Ordained PriestPriest
21 Apr 194945.7AppointedBishop of Ajmer, India
2 Oct 194946.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ajmer, India
13 May 195551.8AppointedBishop of Ajmer and Jaipur, India
15 Nov 197875.3RetiredBishop of Ajmer and Jaipur, India
13 Dec 198784.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Ajmer and Jaipur, India

MicroData Summary for Leo D’Mello:
Bishop Leo D’Mello (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ajmer and Jaipur

  • a priest for 56.2 years
  • a bishop for 38.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 83

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 6 Nov 2013