Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Filippo Maria Cardinal Guidi, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Bologna, Italy

Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati

Prefect of the Congregation of Ecclesiastical Immunity


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jul 1815Born
16 Mar 186347.6Elevated to Cardinal
19 Mar 186347.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Sisto
21 Dec 186348.4AppointedArchbishop of Bologna, Italy
17 Jan 186448.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bologna, Italy
12 Nov 187156.3ResignedArchbishop of Bologna, Italy
29 Jul 187257.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
6 Sep 187257.1AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of Ecclesiastical Immunity
20 Jun 187761.9ResignedCardinal-Priest of San Sisto
27 Feb 187963.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Bologna, Italy

MicroData Summary for Filippo Maria Guidi (VIAF: 62352943)
Filippo Maria Cardinal Guidi O.P. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Bologna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBologna, Archdiocese of Bologna
Ordained BishopChoir Chapel, St. Peter's, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)Dominican Friars Chapel, Campo Verano, Cemetery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 15.1 years
  • a cardinal for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 153, and Page 45
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 53
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 16 Mar 1863
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1864, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Feb 2017