Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hans Ludvig Martensen, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of København {Copenhagen}, Denmark


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Aug 1927Born
15 Aug 195629.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
22 Mar 196537.6AppointedBishop of København {Copenhagen}, Denmark
16 May 196537.7Ordained BishopBishop of København {Copenhagen}, Denmark
22 Mar 199567.6ResignedBishop of København {Copenhagen}, Denmark
13 Mar 201284.5DiedBishop Emeritus of København {Copenhagen}, Denmark

MicroData Summary for Hans Ludvig Martensen
Bishop Hans Ludvig Martensen S.J. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of København {Copenhagen}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKøbenhavn

  • a priest for 55.5 years
  • a bishop for 46.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 14 Mar 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast