Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sergi Gordo Rodríguez

Auxiliary Bishop of Barcelona, Spain

Titular Bishop of Cenae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1967 Born
14 Jun 199225.2Ordained PriestPriest of Barcelona, Spain
19 Jun 201750.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Barcelona, Spain
19 Jun 201750.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Cenae
9 Sep 201750.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cenae

MicroData Summary for Sergi Gordo Rodríguez
Bishop Sergi Gordo Rodríguez (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Barcelona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarcelona, Archdiocese of Barcelona
Ordained Bishopla Sagrada Familia, Basilica, Barcelona, Archdiocese of Barcelona

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Barcelona.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Jun 2017
  • ob/c2: CB, 19 Jun 2017
  • ob: CB, 20 Jun 2017
  • c34: CB, 29 Aug 2017
  • c45: CB, 9 Sep 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 233, Number 19,520

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018