Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Abel Zaya (Zayia), C.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Urmyā {Rezayeh} (Chaldean)

Bishop of Salmas {Shahpour} (Chaldean)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1871BornRézayéh
2 Jul 189625.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
6 Dec 193968.8AppointedArchbishop of Urmyā {Rezayeh} (Chaldean), Iran
6 Dec 193968.8AppointedBishop of Salmas {Shahpour} (Chaldean), Iran
1 Jan 194068.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Urmyā {Rezayeh} (Chaldean), Iran
18 Mar 195180.1DiedArchbishop of Urmyā {Rezayeh} (Chaldean), Iran

MicroData Summary for Abel Zaya (Zayia):
Archbishop Abel Zaya (Zayia) C.M. (born , died ) Archbishop of Urmyā {Rezayeh}

  • a priest for 54.7 years
  • a bishop for 11.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,369
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1940, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013