Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Santino Margaria

Deceased

Bishop of Civita Castellana, Orte e Gallese


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1878BornDronero
26 Dec 190123.2Ordained PriestPriest
9 Oct 193051.9AppointedBishop of Civita Castellana, Orte e Gallese, Italy
18 Jan 193152.2Ordained BishopBishop of Civita Castellana, Orte e Gallese, Italy
2 Mar 193152.3InstalledBishop of Civita Castellana, Orte e Gallese, Italy
20 Dec 194769.1DiedBishop of Civita Castellana, Orte e Gallese, Italy

MicroData Summary for Santino Margaria:
Bishop Santino Margaria (born , died ) Bishop of Civita Castellana, Orte e Gallese

  • a priest for 46.0 years
  • a bishop for 16.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1931, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 10 Nov 2013