Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Geraldo Maciotti

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Ostia (-Velletri)

Titular Bishop of Elusa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1768BornVelletri
24 Sep 179122.8Ordained PriestPriest
23 Mar 180738.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ostia (-Velletri), Italy
23 Mar 180738.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Elusa
1837¹68.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Ostia (-Velletri), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Geraldo Maciotti:
Bishop Geraldo Maciotti (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Ostia (-Velletri)

  • a priest for 45.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 186

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013